+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 179, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Act 179, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 753).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-30-13.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-30-13.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Aquino, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Yamashita, McDermott.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Galuteria, Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamane.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-21-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, CPC, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment No. 6 offered.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-13.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.