+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 186) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.