+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 143, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Act 143, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 157) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 157).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Aquino, Johanson, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Inouye, English Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Aquino, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-05-19.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545).
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1967), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Hashem.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Thursday, 03-14-19 11:10AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 210) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/TRS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor