+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.