+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 3).
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-19.
- Report filed.
- Separated Committee Report.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
- Floor Amendment No. 10 offered.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Fevella.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-01-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.