+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:15AM in conference room 229.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.