+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-16 9:00AM in conference room CR016.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.