+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, McDermott.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 207) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1072) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 413) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor