+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:25AM in conference room 225.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:45AM in conference room 225.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 852).
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 666).
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor