+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-30-15 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Espero, Ihara, Shimabukuro, Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takayama, Thielen.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 169) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.