+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from HRE/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-14-17 2:00PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/TRE, CPH/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor