+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor