+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
- Pass First Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Re-Referred to CPN.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, CPN.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor