+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE, TIA.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.