+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.