+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.