+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.