+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor