+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 209).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor