+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Nishihara.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Thielen.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-22-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:45AM in conference room 211.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.