+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.