+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 44) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor