+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from OMH/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1345) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/VMI on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 205) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN/IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, English, S. Chang, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/IAA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.