+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 63) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor