+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 208, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Act 208, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61).
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kawakami, Thielen.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-09-13.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-05-13.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414).
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 47) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 495) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor