+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, English, L. Thielen, Tokuda.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor