+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/WLA, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.