+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:50PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.