+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 166, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15).
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Harimoto.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Takumi Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-05-17.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-04-17.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387).
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Har, Ing, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Tupola excused (8). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1549), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.