+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM/TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Espero, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi, Slom.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on TRA deferred the measure until 02-17-15 3:01PM in conference room 229.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/TRA, JDL.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor