+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.