+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-13-17 1:16PM in conference room 224.
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-14-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor