+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor