+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-03-21 10:25AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor