+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.