+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 312.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 525).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ward.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-15 11:00AM in conference room 312.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-15 at 11:00 am.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-16-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 158) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.