+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from TRA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kouchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.