+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 181) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1069) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 374) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor