+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor