+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ruderman, Fevella.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 581).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1940) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1410) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 759) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.