+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 041, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 041, on 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 462).
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor