+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carroll Chair; Kobayashi, Fukumoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Green, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-11-13.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-09-13.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-05-13.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 415).
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-01-13.
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, referral sheet 27
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-7-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kidani.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-31-13 9:45AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 2:05PM in conference room 229.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HTH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.