+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor