+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- Act 164, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 164, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91).
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Rhoads, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Nakashima, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 5:00PM; CR 329.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 2:30PM; CR 329.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Nakashima, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Changed: Senator San Buenaventura added as Chair. Senator Ihara discharged as Chair.
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Ihara Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Acasio.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 417).
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1681), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:30PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 100).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.