+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 255, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Act 255, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28).
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, C. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-05-19.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-04-19.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530).
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1928), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Nishimoto.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to HLT/IAC, JUD, referral sheet 27
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.