+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Espero, Ihara, Tokuda.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Say, McDermott.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1979-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 194) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor