+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.