+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor