+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
- Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor