+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor